CT SB01151 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To redefine "quasi-public agency" and "public official" for purposes of the codes of ethics and to require registrants to provide the name, title and contact information for individuals who are authorized filers on its registration statement.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The State Codes Of Ethics.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 233 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 23-37 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-01 | House | House Passed |
2023-05-18 | House | House Calendar Number 543 |
2023-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-16 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | File Number 466 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 271 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |