CT SB01142 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) reduce the interest rate on delinquent property tax payments from eighteen per cent to twelve per cent, (2) require tax collectors to waive interest on such delinquent payments if such delinquency is attributable to error and not any action or failure of the taxpayer, and (3) make technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Certain Delinquent Property Tax Payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-02SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-01SenateJoint Favorable
2023-04-26SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2023-04-04SenateFile Number 434
2023-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 249
2023-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2023-03-06SenatePublic Hearing 03/10
2023-02-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback