CT SB01117 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) include victims of sexual assault and trafficking as protected persons under the state's employment discrimination provisions, (2) revise the definition of stalking as relates to an application for a civil protection order, (3) prohibit a hotel, motel and similar lodging from offering an hourly rate for any sleeping accommodation and require such entities to establish a person's identity by means of a photo identification prior to providing such person any sleeping accommodation, and (4) expand the membership of the Trafficking in Persons Council.
Title
An Act Implementing Additional Measures To Prevent Trafficking In Persons And Expanding The Composition Of The Trafficking In Persons Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 23-20 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-24 | House | House Calendar Number 589 |
2023-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-23 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8441 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | File Number 601 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 355 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |