CT SB01107 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 678
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 678
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To sunset the ambulatory surgical centers tax and subject ambulatory surgical center services to the sales tax.
Title
An Act Concerning The Taxation Of Ambulatory Surgical Center Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | File Number 678 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 406 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/20 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |