CT SB01104 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement certain community restoration and revitalization efforts through the establishment of community development corporations, community development credit unions and community impact zones, using tax revenue from the sale of cannabis and cannabis products and deposits in lieu of taxes payments.
Title
An Act Concerning Community Restoration Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | File Number 663 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 405 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/20 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |