CT SB01103 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 672
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 672
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require emissions and decibel level testing for motor vehicles and motorcycles, establish a higher rate of sales and use taxes for motorcycles and aftermarket motorcycle mufflers that exceed the maximum allowable decibel level and limit the Passport to the Parks fee to one vehicle per owner.
Title
An Act Concerning Emissions And Decibel Level Testing And The Taxation Of Certain Motorcycles And Parts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | File Number 672 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 404 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/20 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |