CT SB01100 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify the elements of the offense of voyeurism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning "upskirting".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-14
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 653
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 805
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 397
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing 04/01
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback