CT SB01098 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To add safeguards against the use of unreliable testimony in a criminal case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Testimony Of Jailhouse Witnesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 370 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 213 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-131
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24SenateHouse Calendar Number 668
2019-05-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-23SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9623
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 844
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 445
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback