CT SB01097 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - File Number 765
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require presidential and gubernatorial candidates to publicly disclose a minimum of their past three years' worth of tax returns in order to gain access to the primary and general election ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring Disclosure Of Presidential And Gubernatorial Candidates' Federal Tax Returns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateFile Number 765
2019-04-18SenateSenate Calendar Number 367
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-18SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback