CT SB01094 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 668
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for CTNext and the innovation place program.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Ctnext And The Innovation Place Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | File Number 668 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 400 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/20 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |