CT SB01091 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the criminal laws of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of Domestic Violence, Revising Statutes Concerning Domestic Violence, Child Custody, Family Relations Matter Filings And Bigotry Or Bias Crimes And Creating A Program To Provide Legal Counsel To Indigents In Restraining Order Cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 301 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 190 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 190 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 192 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 21-78 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10071 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 515 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8812 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8666 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | Senate | File Number 617 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 352 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/31 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |