CT SB01091 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To designate various days and weeks in order to honor or recognize certain groups or raise awareness regarding certain diseases and to create a Centennial Commission on Women's Suffrage account.
Title
An Act Designating Various Days And Weeks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 218 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 19-152 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 667 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9598 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 737 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 338 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |