CT SB01089 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 804
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide that no employer is required to make accommodations for or allow employees to use or possess cannabis in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Cannabis And The Workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 804
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 396
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-18SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback