CT SB01088 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Recommitted to Program Review and Investigations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Recommitted to Program Review and Investigations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning e-government, including to require the designation of an e-government director within the Department of Information Technology, require the Chief Information Officer to compile statistics concerning state agency Internet web site use, to require state agencies to use the central state Internet web site and template for their web sites and to require state agencies to submit their information technology plans annually to the department.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning E-government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Recommitted to Program Review and Investigations | |
2011-04-27 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-19 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-07 | File Number 452 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 262 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |
2011-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Energy and Technology | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |