CT SB01087 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To permit additional methods for service of process on out-of-state financial institutions, limited liability companies and registered foreign limited liability companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Service Of Process On Out-of-state Financial Institutions, Limited Liability Companies And Registered Foreign Limited Liability Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 194 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-41
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 652
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-25SenateFile Number 802
2019-04-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 394
2019-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-29SenatePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback