CT SB01086 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-05 - House Calendar Number 599
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-05 - House Calendar Number 599
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the provision of mental and behavioral health services in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental And Behavioral Health Services.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] | Sen. Craig Miner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 599 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9994 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | File Number 567 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 335 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |