CT SB01086 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 801
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 801
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase penalties imposed upon persons for repeat offenses of driving under the influence of intoxicating drugs or liquor.
Title
An Act Concerning Repeat Driving Under The Influence Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | File Number 801 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 393 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |