CT SB01086 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study whether long-term care programs and planning are sufficient to meet the need for such services.
Title
An Act Concerning Community Long-term Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Human Services |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | File Number 565 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 403 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |