CT SB01085 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - File Number 843
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To legalize and regulate the recreational use of cannabis and to allow for erasure of criminal records for convictions based on the possession of small amounts of cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Legalization Of The Retail Sale And Possession Of Cannabis And Concerning Erasure Of Criminal Records In The Case Of Convictions Based On The Possession Of A Small Amount Of Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 843
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 444
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-10SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-18SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback