CT SB01080 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To revise and update the teachers' retirement system statutes to align with current practices.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Teachers' Retirement System.
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. William Petit [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 364 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 325 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 326 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-186 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 597 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10074 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9279 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | File Number 666 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 395 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |