CT SB01076 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require The University of Connecticut Health Center to obtain the approval of the General Assembly prior to soliciting bids or a request for proposals for a privatization or public-private partnership contract.
Title
An Act Concerning The Submission Of Update Statements, The Removal Of References To Update Bid Statements And The Granting Of Easements On State Land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 394 SENATE AMD A (Y: 90 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 395 AS AMENDED (Y: 84 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 381 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 382 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 395 AS AMENDED (Y: 84 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 381 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 382 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | House | Public Act 21-198 |
2021-06-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | House | House Calendar Number 607 |
2021-06-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10338 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | File Number 494 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 287 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |