CT SB01073 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical corrections.
Title
An Act Concerning Conservation And Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | File Number 643 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 314 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |