CT SB01071 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Auditors of Public Accounts contained in their 2020 annual report.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Auditors Of Public Accounts.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-145 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 444 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 523 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |