CT SB01069 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To redefine "animal", regulate breeding kennels, provide certain procedures concerning the control of rabies and make other minor changes to domestic animal related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Certain Domestic Animal Related Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 200 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 23-17 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-18 | House | House Calendar Number 540 |
2023-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-16 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8014 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-13 | Senate | File Number 556 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 328 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-10 | Senate | No Action |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |