CT SB01065 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To conduct a study of municipalities and homeowners with well water contaminated with uranium.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Municipalities And Homeowners With Well Water Contaminated With Uranium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | File Number 565 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 330 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |