CT SB01064 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) establish early voting beginning in 2023 for certain elections and beginning in 2024 for certain primaries, special elections and referenda, (2) establish the number of days and hours of, and implement procedures for the conduct of, such early voting, (3) provide for same-day election and same-day primary registrations during periods of early voting, (4) make conforming changes to deadlines for the performance of certain duties prior to an election or primary, and (5) require the Secretary of the State to undertake efforts to educate the public about early voting and train registrars of voters regarding the administration of early voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Implementation Of Early Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-02SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-01SenateJoint Favorable
2023-04-26SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2023-04-03SenateFile Number 388
2023-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 224
2023-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM
2023-03-16SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/22
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback