CT SB01064 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow municipalities to waive the interest on property taxes due for the 2020 tax year for real or personal property used for certain purposes, and (2) reduce the rate of interest for certain taxes and assessments.
Title
An Act Concerning A Waiver Of Interest On Property Tax Payments For Certain Real And Personal Property And The Interest Rate For Certain Taxes And Assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | File Number 564 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 329 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |