CT SB01063 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 546
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to develop recommendations for improving the availability of farmland for first-time farmers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Improve Farmland Availability For Beginning Farmers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 106 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateHouse Calendar Number 546
2019-05-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-08SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-11SenateFile Number 640
2019-04-11SenateSenate Calendar Number 307
2019-04-11SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback