CT SB01059 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) establish the Correction Accountability Commission, (2) enhance correction ombuds services, (3) restrict the use of isolated confinement and restraints in correctional facilities, (4) increase transparency concerning restrictive housing measures and the use of restraints in correctional facilities, (5) develop policies concerning social contacts for incarcerated persons, and (6) provide training and certain workers' compensation benefits to correction officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Office Of The Correction Ombuds, The Use Of Isolated Confinement, Seclusion And Restraints, Social Contacts For Incarcerated Persons And Training And Workers' Compensation Benefits For Correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 314 AS AMENDED (Y: 87 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 319 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseVetoed by the Governor
2021-06-21HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-21HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-18HousePublic Act 21-110
2021-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2021-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-05HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10195
2021-06-05HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-05HouseRules Suspended
2021-06-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 601
2021-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-06-04HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
2021-06-04SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-04SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 10075
2021-06-04SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10009
2021-05-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-05-25SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-24SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-05-24SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-05-24SenateJoint Favorable
2021-05-18SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-26SenateFile Number 616
2021-04-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 348
2021-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-09SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-18SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2021-03-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB01059&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00110-R00SB-01059-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09309-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09303-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09794-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO09831-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10009-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10021-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00SB-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10250-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10237-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10256-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10251-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10252-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01059-R000616-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01059-R000616-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO09303-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO09309-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO09794-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO09831-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10021-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10009-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10075-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01059-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01059-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10195-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10250-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10252-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10256-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01059-R00LCO10251-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/SUM/PDF/2021SUM00110-R02SB-01059-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R00JUD-CV112-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R00JUDA-CV113-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-01059-R00APP-CV123-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00321-R00SB01059-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00320-R00SB01059-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00319-R00SB01059-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00314-R00SB01059-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00313-R00SB01059-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback