CT SB01054 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - File Number 106
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To add two additional members who represent private youth camps to the Youth Camp Safety Advisory Council within the Office of Early Childhood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Youth Advisory Council On Summer Camps Within The Office Of Early Childhood.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-03 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateFile Number 106
2023-03-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 97
2023-03-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-02SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/24
2023-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback