CT SB01052 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - File Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities, in consultation with the Department of Administrative Services, to issue a request for proposals for the conducting of a disparity study.
Title
An Act Concerning A Disparity Study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 459 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 277 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |