CT SB01047 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require: (1) The Insurance Commissioner to (A) develop and implement criteria for each insurer doing business in this state to annually submit a report to the commissioner concerning climate risk, and (B) annually submit a report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to insurance; and (2) each insurer doing business in this state to annually submit a report to the commissioner concerning climate risk.
Title
An Act Concerning Insurance And Climate Change.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] |
Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 372 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 239 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |