CT SB01046 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Require the Insurance Commissioner to develop and disseminate a minimum set of affordable benefit options for long-term care policies; (2) provide that an insurance company, fraternal benefit society, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or health care center shall not deliver, issue, renew, continue or amend a long-term care policy in this state unless such company, society, corporation or center is authorized or licensed to sell long-term care insurance and at least one other line of insurance in this state; (3) require the Insurance Commissioner to refer an insurance company, fraternal benefit society, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or health care center that files a rate filing for a long-term care policy that contains a deliberate or reckless misstatement or omission of fact to the Attorney General for investigation; (4) provide that an insurance company, fraternal benefit society, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or health care center that files a rate filing for a long-term care policy that seeks an increase of twenty per cent or more and spreads such increase over a period of not less than three years shall not file a rate filing for an increase in premium rates for the long-term care policy during said period; (5) require an insurance company, fraternal benefit society, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or health care center that files a rate filing for a long-term care policy to disclose to insureds the minimum set of affordable benefit options developed by the Insurance Commissioner; and (6) authorize the Attorney General to investigate a rate filing referred to the Attorney General by the Insurance Commissioner and take action to protect and secure compensation for the insured under the long-term care policy that is the subject of such rate filing.
Title
An Act Concerning Long-term Care Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 334 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 226 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 226 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-150 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 544 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8470 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 371 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 238 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |