CT SB01043 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 368
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - File Number 368
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Prohibit The Hartford Courant Company and its legal successors from incurring any debt or issuing any dividend that is not in the public interest; and (2) authorize the Attorney General and certain persons to seek injunctive relief against The Hartford Courant Company or its successors if The Hartford Courant Company or its successors incur any debt or issue any dividend that is not in the public interest.
Title
An Act Concerning The Hartford Courant.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 368 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 235 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |