CT SB01040 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the use of substandard and counterfeit airbags.
Title
An Act Concerning Counterfeit And Nonfunctional Airbags And Unlawful Parking In Spaces Reserved For Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-282 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 591 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6718 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | Senate | File Number 315 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 241 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |