CT SB01038 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Allow protected cells of captive insurance companies to establish and maintain separate accounts, and transfer risk to such accounts; and (2) exempt dormant captive insurance companies from paying minimum premium tax.
Title
An Act Concerning Captive Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 201 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 23-15 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-19 | House | House Calendar Number 553 |
2023-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-17 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8136 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2023-04-03 | Senate | File Number 384 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 220 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |