CT SB01030 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - File Number 149
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Banking to study lending issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Lending Issues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateFile Number 149
2023-03-21SenateSenate Calendar Number 114
2023-03-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-03-21SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-15SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-08SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-07SenateJoint Favorable
2023-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2023-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback