CT SB01024 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study tourism and its effects and impact on the state and its economy.
Title
An Act Concerning A Matching Grant Program In Regional Tourism Districts.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] | Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 53 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 53 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 19-101 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Calendar Number 474 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 381 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 181 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |