CT SB01023 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To amend various statutes relating to the responsibilities of the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities with respect to the provision of sexual harassment training, the filing of discriminatory practice complaints, the approval of affirmative action plans, the administration of oaths, the deprivation of rights, privileges or immunities on account of age, and reasonable accommodation of a person with a disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 310 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-06-21SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-21SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-18SenatePublic Act 21-109
2021-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2021-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-05SenateHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10184
2021-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-21SenateHouse Calendar Number 541
2021-05-21SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-05-20SenateOn Consent Calendar
2021-05-20SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-20SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9042
2021-04-26SenateFile Number 614
2021-04-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 345
2021-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-09SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-09SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-11SenatePublic Hearing 03/15
2021-03-10SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB01023&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01023-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/S/PDF/2021SB-01023-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00109-R00SB-01023-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/amd/S/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10203-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10206-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO10187-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01023-R000614-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01023-R000614-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021SB-01023-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00LCO09042-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021SB-01023-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00LCO10187-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00LCO10184-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00LCO10206-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021SB-01023-R00LCO10203-FNA.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/S/PDF/2021SB-01023-R00JUD-CV142-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00239-R00SB01023-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00310-R00SB01023-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00309-R00SB01023-HV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback