CT SB01018 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To withhold or impose restrictions on the use of certain education grants on certain school districts that are not experiencing academic improvement, and to include the collection of student outcome data relating to college and career readiness in the state-wide public school information system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Opportunity Gap.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 384 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-130
2019-06-05HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 731
2019-06-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-05HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10663
2019-05-20SenateFile Number 918
2019-05-20SenateSenate Calendar Number 547
2019-05-20SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
2019-03-08SenatePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback