CT SB01015 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - File Number 538
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - File Number 538
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the Commissioner of Education to grant certain school districts waivers from certain state education mandates.
Title
An Act Establishing A Process For Waiving State Education Mandates For Certain School Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 538 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 282 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |