CT SB01014 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the funding for treatment and rehabilitation of compulsive gamblers.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Compulsive Gambling Treatment And Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 539 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 262 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |