CT SB01014 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various revisions and editions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions And Additions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 17-68 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Calendar Number 615 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7652 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | File Number 569 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 303 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |