CT SB01007 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance and Medicaid coverage for certain surgical procedures performed, and certain outpatient prescription drugs prescribed, to treat severe obesity.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance And Medicaid Coverage For The Treatment Of Severe Obesity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 364 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 231 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |