CT SB01005 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - File Number 600
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) make technical revisions to distinguish references to emergency medical service organizations and personnel, (2) allow ambulance services to add a branch location, and (3) require emergency medical services personnel to initiate, renew and maintain certifications through national curriculum and testing requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Revisions To Emergency Medical Services Definitions, Certification And Continuing Education Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 600
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 301
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback