CT SB01004 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow children, stepchildren and other dependent children to retain dental and vision insurance coverage under their parents' insurance policies until they attain the age of twenty-six or obtain substitute coverage through an employer.
Title
An Act Concerning Dental And Vision Insurance Coverage For Children, Stepchildren And Other Dependent Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 339 SENATE AMD A (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 340 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 340 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-149 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 539 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8993 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | Senate | File Number 323 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 208 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |