CT SB01003 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - File Number 636
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To reduce the use of single-use plastic bags in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of Single-use Plastic And Paper Bags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateFile Number 636
2019-04-11SenateSenate Calendar Number 305
2019-04-11SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-06SenatePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-03-05SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback