CT SB01001 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit smoking in state parks.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Smoking On Beaches In State Parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 MOTION TO PT (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule B 7771 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6732 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | File Number 486 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 271 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |