CT SB00999 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - File Number 404
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for a just transition to climate-protective energy production and community investment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Just Transition To Climate-protective Energy Production And Community Investment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateFile Number 404
2021-04-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 248
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-05SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
2021-03-24SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-23SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-05SenatePublic Hearing 03/11
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback