CT SB00999 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to the statutes concerning the State Fire Marshal.
Title
An Act Requiring Fire Suppression Systems For Patrol Cars Only If Available From A Manufacturer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 338 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 335 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 335 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-178 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 600 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6018 | |
2011-03-22 | File Number 133 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Calendar Number 130 | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |